SB408 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Parks, Spearman, Segerblom, Cancela, Atkinson, Cannizzaro, Ford, Ratti, Woodhouse, Araujo, Joiner

Establishes conditions for the performance of certain surgical procedures. (BDR 54-615)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 07, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 14, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 24, 2017   Yea 11,   Nay 10,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2017

  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly.

Apr 25, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 20, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)