SB410 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Manendo, Parks

Revises provisions relating to reckless driving. (BDR 43-72)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Mar 28, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     Mar 30, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Apr 13, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     Apr 24, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Transportation     May 02, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     May 18, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 24, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 829   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 03, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Notice of exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

Apr 25, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 31, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 829.) To printer.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)