SB432 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing proceedings for the termination of parental rights. (BDR 38-475)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 568.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 26, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 11, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Judiciary     May 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Judiciary     May 19, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 19, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Conference Committee
Jun 03, 2017 04: 20 PM Conference Report


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 286     Amend. No. 886     Amend. No. CA2   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 28, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 286.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 886.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 886 not concurred in. To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.

May 30, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 886 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

May 31, 2017

  • In Senate.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 886 and further amend.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • (Conference Amend. No. CA2.)
  • To printer.

Jun 05, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint .
  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 568.

Effective January 1, 2018.