SB433 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions relating to guardianships. (BDR 13-487)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 390.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 29, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     May 15, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 16, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Judiciary     May 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 02, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 33,   Nay 7,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 484     Amend. No. 790   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 28, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 484.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 790.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 29, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 790 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 30, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 390.

Sections 1 to 36, inclusive, 38, 39, 40 and 41 effective on July 1, 2017. Section 37 effective on July 1, 2017, if, and only if, Assembly Bill No. 319 of this session is enacted by the Legislature and becomes effective.