SB444 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Finance

Makes an appropriation to the Department of Veterans Services to provide assistance and support for the Adopt a Vet Dental Program. (BDR S-147)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation not included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 462.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     May 15, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 01, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 04, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Jun 03, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 1142   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of exemption.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1142.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.)
  • To printer.

Jun 05, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1142 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.
  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 462.

Effective July 1, 2017.