SB45 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions relating to the State Public Works Division of the Department of Administration. (BDR 28-128)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Chapter 27.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 15, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 17, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Government Affairs     Mar 21, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 05, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb 22, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 11, 2017   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 20, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 21, 2017

  • Read second time.

Feb 22, 2017

Feb 23, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 08, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2017

May 15, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 17, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 18, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor.

May 19, 2017

  • Chapter 27.
  • This act becomes effective upon passage and approval.