SB46 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions governing background checks of operators, employees and certain adult residents of a child care facility. (BDR 38-131)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 218.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 20, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 28, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Senate Finance     May 08, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda            Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 19, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 145     Amend. No. 718   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 12, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 145.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2017

Apr 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 18, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 718.) To printer.

May 19, 2017

May 22, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 23, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 718 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 25, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 30, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 218.
  • Effective July 1, 2017.