SB466 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Commerce, Labor and Energy

Makes various changes relating to the State Board of Oriental Medicine. (BDR 54-557)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 255.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Mar 31, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     Apr 07, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 26, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     May 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 186   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 186.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2017

Apr 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee.

May 08, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 09, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 11, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 15, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 16, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 26, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 255.

Effective October 1, 2017. Section 4 expires by limitation January 1, 2019.