SB47 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Natural Resources

Makes various changes relating to the appropriation of water. (BDR 48-499)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 517.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Feb 07, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 07, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 16, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 28, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 04, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda            Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 13, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 3-28-17   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 04, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Senate Natural Resources     May 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 18, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 31,   Nay 10,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0

Conference Committee
Jun 05, 2017 10: 00 AM Conference report not available.


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 601     Amend. No. 602     Amend. No. 832   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 601 and 602.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 23, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 832.) To printer.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 832 not concurred in. To Assembly.

May 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 832 not receded from. Conference requested. Conference Committee appointed by Assembly. To Senate.

Jun 04, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Conference Committee appointed by Senate. To committee.

Jun 05, 2017

  • From committee: Concur in Assembly Amendment No. 832.
  • Conference report adopted by Senate.
  • Conference report adopted by Assembly.
  • To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 517.
  • Effective June 9, 2017.