SB473 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Judiciary

Excludes juveniles from increased penalties for certain sexual offenses. (BDR 15-346)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 263.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 11, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     May 11, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 16, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 02, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 23, 2017   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2017

Apr 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 16, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 17, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 18, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 26, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 263.

Effective October 1, 2017.