SB477 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Government Affairs

Enacts provisions relating to residential establishments for persons with disabilities. (BDR 22-146)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Assembly Amendment No. 777 concurred in. To enrollment.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 02, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 17, 2017     10:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 24, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 13,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 458     Amend. No. 777   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 458.) To printer.

Apr 24, 2017

Apr 25, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 777.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 777 concurred in. To enrollment.