SB478 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions relating to certain disciplinary action against state employees. (BDR 23-1043)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 581.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 12, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     May 22, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 30, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     Jun 02, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Heard   Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 31, 2017   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 04, 2017   Yea 35,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 1021     Amend. No. 1101   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Apr 18, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 31, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1021.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1101.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 04, 2017

Jun 05, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1101 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 581.

Effective July 1, 2017.