SB481 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Creates the Nevada Commission for Persons Who Are Deaf, Hard of Hearing or Speech Impaired. (BDR 38-604)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Not considered
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 19, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 27, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 02, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 39,   Nay 0,   Excused 3,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 288     Amend. No. 889   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 288.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 889.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. To printer.

May 25, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To committee.

Jun 02, 2017

Jun 03, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 889 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 06, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 429.

Effective July 1, 2017.