SB482 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to health care facilities. (BDR 40-605)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 578.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 31, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     May 13, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 31, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 04, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2017   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 29,   Nay 13,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 157   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 1068   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1068.) To printer.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 13.) To Senate.

Jun 05, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 13, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 578.

Effective June 13, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.