SB484 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to the licensing of foster homes. (BDR 38-348)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 19, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 290     Amend. No. 611   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 290.) To printer.

Apr 19, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 20, Nays: 1.)
  • Action of passage reconsidered.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 611.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.