SB488 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spearman, Cancela, Woodhouse, Parks, Denis, Farley, Ford, Miller, Joiner, Diaz, Neal, Spiegel, Thompson

Revises provisions relating to certain crimes. (BDR 15-1086)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 569.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 11, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 12, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Judiciary     May 12, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     May 17, 2017     01:28 PM          Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Judiciary     May 25, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 31, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 19, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 701   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 778     Amend. No. 1078   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Apr 17, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 17, 2017.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Taken from Second Reading File. Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 778.) To printer.

May 19, 2017

May 22, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1078.) To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 1078 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 569.

Effective October 1, 2017.