SB50 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Health and Human Services

Provides for advance directives governing the provision of psychiatric care. (BDR 40-174)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 154.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 27, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 27, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Reschedule
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 05, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 28, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 154     Amend. No. 717   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 154.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2017

Apr 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 16, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 17, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 717.) To printer.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 22, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 717 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 154.

Effective May 26, 2017.