SB502 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Government Affairs

Makes various changes relating to the Public Employees' Benefits Program and the Public Employees' Deferred Compensation Program. (BDR 18-979)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 302.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 10, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 03, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     May 08, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 10, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 11, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 24, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Heard   Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 16, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 40,   Nay 0,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 459   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 459.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass as amended.

May 16, 2017

May 17, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 24, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 29, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 302.

Effective June 1, 2017, for the purpose of appointing, pursuant to section 51 of this act, members to the Board of the Public Employees' Benefits Program created by NRS 287.041, as amended by section 15 of this act; and on July 1, 2017, for all other purposes.