SB508 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Revenue and Economic Development

Imposes an excise tax on sales of marijuana and related products by a retail marijuana store. (BDR 32-976)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 06, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 13, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Re-refer

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)