SB51 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Natural Resources

Makes various changes relating to the adjudication of vested water rights. (BDR 48-180)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 156.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Feb 07, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 02, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 16, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     Mar 30, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 04, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 09, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 61   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 61.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 156.

Effective May 26, 2017.