SB510 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provision governing the eligibility of a child for assistance from the Kinship Guardianship Assistance Program. (BDR 38-901)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 254.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 31, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 10, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Finance     Apr 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 04, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Not Heard
  Senate Finance     May 08, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda            Do pass
  Assembly Judiciary     May 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard   Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 11, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 23, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Read second time.
  • Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 09, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 11, 2017

May 15, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 18, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 22, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 23, 2017

May 24, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 26, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 31, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 254.

Effective May 31, 2017.