SB512 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Natural Resources

Revises provisions relating to fees for the use of certain state lands. (BDR 26-906)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 06, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     Apr 26, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 15, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 25, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard   Do pass, failed   Reconsidered of previous action on: 5-25-17   Do pass
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 02, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda            Mentioned

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 16,   Nay 5,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 33,   Nay 8,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 178     Amend. No. 734   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 178.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 734.) To printer.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

May 18, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Secretary's desk.

May 22, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) To Assembly.

May 23, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 26, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 30, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 366.

Effective July 1, 2017.