SB59 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to the program to monitor prescriptions for certain controlled substances. (BDR 40-386)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 219.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 20, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Apr 12, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 22, 2017   Yea 34,   Nay 7,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 279     Amend. No. 591     Amend. No. 743   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 279.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 591.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Printer.

Apr 26, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 743.) To printer.

May 22, 2017

May 23, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 743 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 25, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 30, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 219.

Effective July 1, 2017.