SB60 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions governing Medicaid payments for ground emergency medical transportation services. (BDR 38-411)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
In Senate.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 14, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 13, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 03, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 15, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Not considered
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 39,   Nay 1,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 90     Amend. No. 802   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 11, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 90.) To printer.

Apr 12, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 802.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.