SB62 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing the penalty for battery which constitutes domestic violence. (BDR 15-406)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Apr 06, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 20, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)