SB71 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Health and Human Services

Revises provisions relating to medical facilities, facilities for the dependent and certain other facilities. (BDR 40-183)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 326.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 27, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 06, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 12, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 09, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 36,   Nay 4,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 716   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 07, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 08, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 09, 2017

Mar 10, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 716.) To printer.

May 25, 2017

May 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Assembly Amendment No. 716 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 29, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 326.

Effective July 1, 2017.