SB80 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Government Affairs

Makes various changes relating to the Public Employees' Benefits Program and the Deferred Compensation Program. (BDR 18-243)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 09, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     Feb 22, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Mentioned No Jurisdiction   Heard, No Action
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     Mar 09, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 20, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 15, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)