SB84 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Legislative Operations and Elections

Makes various changes relating to ethics in government. (BDR 23-250)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 384.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 09, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 27, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 12, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     May 18, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 526     Amend. No. 840   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 526.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

May 25, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 840.) To printer.

May 26, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 30, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 840 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 384.

Sections 1 to 15.5, inclusive,16.5 to 30, inclusive, and section 31 effective on July 1, 2017. Sections 15.7 and 16 effective on January 1, 2018.