SB91 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 27, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Revises provisions relating to drug donation programs. (BDR 40-271)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 153.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 20, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 10, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Apr 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 42,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 4     Amend. No. 92     Amend. No. 402     Amend. No. 712   

Bill History

Jan 27, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Jan 30, 2017

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Mar 27, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 28, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. Nos. 4 and 92.)
  • To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 402.) To printer.

Apr 18, 2017

Apr 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 15, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 712.) To printer.

May 16, 2017

  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Third reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Senate.

May 22, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 712 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 26, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 153.

Effective May 26, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.