SB92 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 27, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Hardy

Revises provisions relating to the Task Force on Alzheimer's Disease. (BDR S-270)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 15, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Mar 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb 28, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 22, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Jan 27, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Jan 30, 2017

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 23, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 27, 2017

  • Read second time.

Feb 28, 2017

Mar 01, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

Mar 20, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 21, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 22, 2017

Mar 23, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Mar 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Mar 30, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 7.
  • This act becomes effective upon passage and approval.