SB95 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Jan 30, 2017.
By: Health and Human Services

Requires an analysis of the adequacy of Medicaid reimbursement rates for personal care services. (BDR S-368)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 13, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Feb 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     Apr 03, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Jan 30, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Jan 31, 2017

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 20, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Feb 23, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)