AB101 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 03, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Sprinkle

Revises provisions governing the management of wildlife. (BDR 45-187)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Feb 21, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     Feb 23, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Natural Resources     May 04, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Natural Resources     May 11, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 26,   Nay 16,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 7   
Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 206     Amend. No. 678   

Bill History

Feb 03, 2017

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To printer.
  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 05, 2017

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Taken from Chief Clerk's desk.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 206.) To printer.

Apr 21, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 678.) To printer.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment No. 678 concurred in. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor.
  • Returned to Assembly with Governor's veto message.

May 26, 2017

  • Bill read. Placed on Chief Clerk's desk.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)