AB13 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 15, 2016.
By: Judiciary

Revises provisions governing the annual fee for conducting business in Nevada. (BDR 7-3)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 5.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 21, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 24, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 13, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Mar 17, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Feb 28, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 22, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Nov 15, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 24, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 27, 2017

  • Read second time.

Feb 28, 2017

Mar 01, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

Mar 20, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Mar 21, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 22, 2017

Mar 23, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

Mar 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Mar 30, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 5.

Effective July 1, 2017.