AB186 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Diaz

Revises provisions relating to education. (BDR 34-868)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Government Affairs     Feb 14, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Education     Mar 22, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Education     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        

Proposed Amendments     Amend. No. 478   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled pursuant to JSR 14.2.1(d).
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Feb 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.