AB375 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 20, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Sprinkle, Benitez-Thompson, Joiner, Daly

Allows the imposition of certain taxes, fees, rates, charges, levies or assessments in a county to fund approved flood management projects of a flood management authority based on the recommendations of a flood control project needs committee. (BDR S-473)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 557.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 04, 2017     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 13, 2017     04:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     May 02, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     May 16, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 39,   Nay 3,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 14,   Nay 7,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 439     Amend. No. 771   

Bill History

Mar 20, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer.

Mar 22, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 439.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee.

May 25, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 771.) To printer.

May 26, 2017

Jun 04, 2017

  • Senate Amendment No. 771 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 557.

Effective June 12, 2017. Section 1 of this act expires by limitation on April 2, 2018.