AB413 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Judiciary

Makes various changes relating to electronic documents and electronic signatures. (BDR 12-597)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 511.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Judiciary     Mar 27, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 07, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda            Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 14, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 01, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 30, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 03, 2017     08:28 PM          Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 02, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 1,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 20,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    4th Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 415     Amend. No. 1041     Amend. No. 1137     Amend. No. 1148   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Mar 28, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 415.) Rereferred to Committee on Ways and Means. Exemption effective. To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1041.)
  • Dispensed with reprinting.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 41, Nays: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint .
  • To Senate.
  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1137.)
  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • To printer.

Jun 05, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Secretary's desk.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1148.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Fourth reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Senate Amendment Nos. 1137 and 1148 concurred in. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 511.

Sections 56 to 60, inclusive, and 63 of this act effective June 9, 2017. Sections 1 to 28, inclusive, and 61 of this act effective on July 1, 2017. Sections 29 to 55, inclusive, and 62 of this act effective: (a) June 9, 2017, for the purpose of adopting any rules and regulations and performing any other preparatory administrative tasks that are necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and (b) on July 1, 2018, for all other purposes.