SB265 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 14, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Cancela, Segerblom, Atkinson, Parks, Cannizzaro, Denis, Farley, Ford, Manendo, Woodhouse

Revises provisions relating to prescription drugs. (BDR 40-809)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
No further consideration.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     Mar 29, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Health and Human Services     Apr 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 03, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 13, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 15, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 24, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Health and Human Services     May 25, 2017     01:20 PM          Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 26, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          After Passage Discussion

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 19, 2017   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (3rd Reprint)       May 25, 2017   Yea 26,   Nay 14,   Excused 2,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    3rd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 637     Amend. No. 736     Amend. No. 830   

Bill History

Mar 14, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

Mar 15, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.

May 09, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

May 11, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 637.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

May 12, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 736.) To printer.

May 19, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint .
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 830.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.)
  • To printer.

May 22, 2017

  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Third reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee.

May 25, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 26, Nays: 14, Excused: 2.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Made Special Order of Business for Monday, June 5, 2017, at 11:30 a.m.
  • Bill read.
  • No further consideration.