SB41 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 16, 2016.
By: Judiciary

Revises various provisions relating to business entities. (BDR 7-425)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 355.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Judiciary     Feb 20, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Judiciary     Mar 02, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Judiciary     Apr 21, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Judiciary     May 11, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 26, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 31   

Bill History

Nov 16, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 31.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee.

May 22, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 23, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 24, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 25, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 26, 2017

May 29, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 30, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 355.

Effective October 1, 2017.