SB427 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 23, 2017.
By: Transportation

Revises provisions governing the crew of certain freight trains. (BDR 58-1014)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2019 Session.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Transportation     Apr 06, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Transportation     Apr 13, 2017     09:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     May 02, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     May 22, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 22, 2017     05:15 PM          Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 5-22-17   Do pass as amended
  Assembly Transportation     May 25, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Transportation     May 30, 2017     02:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 23, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 11,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 321   

Bill History

Mar 23, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To printer.

Mar 24, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 321.)
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass as amended.
  • Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 12, Nays: 9.) To Assembly.

May 24, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Transportation. To committee.

May 30, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 31, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2017

Jun 04, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 05, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Vetoed by the Governor. (Return to 2019 Session.)

Return to 2019 Session.