SB486 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Government Affairs

Provides for collective bargaining by state employees. (BDR 23-1040)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 07, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 14, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Withdrawn
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Apr 18, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Government Affairs     May 26, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 983   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.

May 29, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 983.) To printer.

May 30, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time.
  • Taken from General File. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee.
  • Exemption effective.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)