SB487 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Revenue and Economic Development

Revises provisions relating to sales of marijuana and related products. (BDR 32-818)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 541.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     Apr 06, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Taxation     Apr 11, 2017     02:00 PM      Agenda            Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     May 09, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Revenue and Economic Development     May 23, 2017     11:32 AM          Minutes          Rescind previous action on: 5-09-17   Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Judiciary     Jun 03, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Assembly Taxation     Jun 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda            Heard   Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 01, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 01, 2017   Yea 12,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Reconsideration    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 04, 2017   Yea 15,   Nay 6,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (2nd Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 32,   Nay 9,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 1,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    2nd Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 901     Amend. No. 1145   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary.
  • Action of referral rescinded.
  • Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Waiver granted effective: April 13, 2017.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 901.) To printer.

May 24, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for Friday, May 26, 2017.

May 26, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 29, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 30, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for Thursday, June 1, 2017.

Jun 01, 2017

Jun 04, 2017

  • Action of lossage rescinded.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1145.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 15, Nays: 6.)
  • To printer.
  • From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To committee.

Jun 05, 2017

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 12, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 541.

Effective July 1, 2017.