SB539 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on May 16, 2017.
Emergency Request of Senate Minority Leader
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Roberson, Gansert, Atkinson, Cancela, Cannizzaro, Denis, Farley, Ford, Goicoechea, Harris, Manendo, Parks, Ratti, Segerblom, Settelmeyer, Spearman, Woodhouse

Revises provisions relating to prescription drugs. (BDR 40-1217)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 592.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Health and Human Services     May 26, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Health and Human Services     Jun 03, 2017     01:08 PM          Minutes          Without recommendation
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 05, 2017     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 05, 2017   Yea 27,   Nay 15,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 1146   

Bill History

May 16, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer.

May 17, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From committee: Without recommendation.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

Jun 04, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk.
  • Taken from Secretary's desk. Placed on General File.
  • Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1146.)
  • Reprinting dispensed with.
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 2.)
  • To printer.

Jun 05, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint . To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.
  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 27, Nays: 15.) To Senate.
  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 15, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 592.

Sections 26.9 and 28 effective June 15, 2017. Section 8.6 effective July 1, 2017. Sections 1 to 6.5, inclusive, 7.5, 8, 9 and 26.6 effective June 15, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and October 1, 2017, for all other purposes. Sections 10 to 26.3, inclusive, and 27 effective June 15, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2018, for all other purposes. Section 7 effective June 15, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations and performing any other administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and May 1, 2018, for all other purposes.