AJR10 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Mar 15, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Brooks, Frierson, Yeager, Watkins, Benitez-Thompson, Paul Anderson, Araujo, Bilbray-Axelrod, Bustamante Adams, Carlton, Carrillo, Cohen, Daly, Flores, Fumo, Jauregui, Joiner, McCurdy II, Miller, Monroe-Moreno, Neal, Ohrenschall, Spiegel, Thompson, Segerblom, Ford, Cancela, Spearman, Cannizzaro, Manendo, Ratti, Roberson, Woodhouse

Expresses opposition to the development of a repository for spent nuclear fuel and high-level radioactive waste at Yucca Mountain in the State of Nevada. (BDR R-1012)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 29.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 17, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          To Subcommittee
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 20, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Subcommittee heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 03, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Subcommittee recommends do pass
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 05, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Apr 10, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 08, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 12, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Apr 21, 2017   Yea 32,   Nay 6,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    May 17, 2017   Yea 19,   Nay 2,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     As Enrolled       


Bill History

Mar 15, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Mar 16, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from Second Reading File.
  • Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day.

Apr 13, 2017

  • Read second time.

Apr 14, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 18, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 20, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 15, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

May 16, 2017

  • Read second time.

May 17, 2017

May 18, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 29.

Effective May 23, 2017.