SJR2 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Feb 13, 2017.
By: (Bolded name indicates primary sponsorship)
Spearman, Cancela, Cannizzaro, Ratti, Woodhouse, Atkinson, Denis, Farley, Ford, Manendo, Parks, Segerblom, Araujo, Bilbray-Axelrod, Brooks, Bustamante Adams, Carlton, Carrillo, Cohen, Diaz, Frierson, Jauregui, Joiner, Miller, Monroe-Moreno, Ohrenschall, Spiegel, Sprinkle, Yeager

Ratifies the Equal Rights Amendment to the Constitution of the United States. (BDR R-13)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
File No. 13.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 20, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Legislative Operations and Elections     Feb 22, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 07, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 09, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned not agendized
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 14, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Legislative Operations and Elections     Mar 16, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage     (As Introduced)    Mar 01, 2017   Yea 13,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Mar 20, 2017   Yea 28,   Nay 14,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 50   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 60   

Bill History

Feb 13, 2017

  • Prefiled.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To printer.

Feb 14, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Feb 27, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.

Feb 28, 2017

  • Read second time.

Mar 01, 2017

Mar 02, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Legislative Operations and Elections. To committee.

Mar 16, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Mar 17, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 50.) To printer.

Mar 20, 2017

Mar 21, 2017

  • In Senate.

Mar 22, 2017

  • Assembly Amendment No. 50 concurred in. To enrollment.
  • Enrolled and delivered to Secretary of State.
  • File No. 13.

Effective March 22, 2017.