SB506 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Education

Revises provisions relating to education savings accounts and education funding. (BDR 34-1101)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Contains Appropriation included in Executive Budget.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(No further action taken.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Apr 11, 2017     05:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Re-refer
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 12, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Finance     May 12, 2017     08:45 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 23, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 29, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes      
  Senate Finance     May 29, 2017     06:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     May 30, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction

Final Passage Votes


Bill Text     As Introduced        


Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 12, 2017

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.

May 09, 2017

  • From committee: Re-refer to Committee on Education.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Education. To committee.

Jun 06, 2017

  • (No further action taken.)