SB511 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Mar 27, 2017.
By: Natural Resources

Revises provisions governing boating and wildlife. (BDR 45-896)
DECLARED EXEMPT

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: Increases or Newly Provides for Term of Imprisonment in County or City Jail or Detention Facility.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 533.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Mar 31, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned No Jurisdiction
  Senate Natural Resources     Apr 06, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass, and re-refer
  Senate Finance     May 10, 2017     06:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Ways and Means     May 18, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned
  Senate Finance     May 20, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Senate Finance     May 23, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining     May 31, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 30, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2017   Yea 34,   Nay 8,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 926   

Bill History

Mar 27, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources. To printer.

Mar 29, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.

Apr 04, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass, and re-refer to Committee on Finance.
  • Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. Exemption effective.

May 29, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 926.) To printer.

May 30, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Natural Resources, Agriculture, and Mining. To committee.

May 31, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 02, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 03, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Jun 04, 2017

Jun 05, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 533.

Sections 6.5 and 29 effective June 9, 2017. Sections 1 to 6, inclusive, and 7 to 28, inclusive, effective: June 9, 2017, for the purpose of adopting regulations or performing any preparatory administrative tasks necessary to carry out the provisions of this act; and January 1, 2018, for all other purposes.