SB552 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Jun 01, 2017.
By: Finance

Revises provisions governing the cost of certain coverage under the Public Employees' Benefits Program. (BDR 23-1226)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

CONTAINS UNFUNDED MANDATE
Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 536.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Jun 01, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Finance     Jun 02, 2017     See Agenda      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Ways and Means     Jun 04, 2017     11:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard   Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 03, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Jun 04, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 4,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 1113   

Bill History

Jun 01, 2017

  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer.

Jun 02, 2017

  • From printer. To committee.
  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1113.) To printer.

Jun 03, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. (Yeas: 21, Nays: None.) To Assembly.
  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee.

Jun 04, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 4.) To Senate.

Jun 05, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

Jun 08, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 09, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 536.

Sections 2, 3.5 and 5 effective June 9, 2017. Sections 1, 3 and 4 effective on July 1, 2017.