SB76 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Education

Revises provisions governing the investment of money held by the State or certain political subdivisions of the State. (BDR 31-431)

Fiscal Notes

Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: No.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
(Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Education     Feb 14, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Education     Feb 28, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Education     Mar 09, 2017     03:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned Not Agendized
  Assembly Government Affairs     Apr 27, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 17, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 15   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Education. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 07, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 10, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 15.) To printer.

Apr 11, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 12, 2017

  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 17, 2017

Apr 18, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 20, 2017

  • (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.3, no further action allowed.)