SB79 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Senate on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Government Affairs

Revises provisions concerning the confidentiality of certain personal information of certain persons and entities. (BDR 20-400)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 294.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Government Affairs     Feb 27, 2017     01:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Assembly Transportation     Apr 11, 2017     03:15 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Mentioned no jurisdiction
  Senate Government Affairs     Apr 12, 2017     12:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 02, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Government Affairs     May 18, 2017     10:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended

Final Passage Votes
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 25, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 24, 2017   Yea 41,   Nay 0,   Excused 1,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 310   
Other Amendments   
(see bill history below)
 Amend. No. 822   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To printer.

Nov 23, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Feb 20, 2017

  • Notice of eligibility for exemption.

Apr 24, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 310.) To printer.

Apr 25, 2017

Apr 26, 2017

  • In Assembly.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Government Affairs. To committee.

May 23, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.
  • Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution.
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

May 24, 2017

May 25, 2017

  • In Senate. To enrollment.

May 27, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

Jun 01, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 294.

Effective October 1, 2017.