AB61 View Bill in NELIS
Introduced in the Assembly on Nov 17, 2016.
By: Commerce and Labor

Revises provisions governing trust companies. (BDR 55-162)

Fiscal Notes
View Fiscal Notes
Effect on Local Government: No.
Effect on State: Yes.

Most Recent History Action:
(See full list below)
Approved by the Governor. Chapter 125.

Upcoming Hearings

Past Hearings
  Senate Finance     Jan 31, 2017     08:30 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Discussed as BDR
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Feb 17, 2017     12:00 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard
  Assembly Commerce and Labor     Mar 01, 2017     01:30 PM      Agenda       Minutes          Amend, and do pass as amended
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 08, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Heard, No Action
  Senate Commerce, Labor and Energy     May 17, 2017     08:00 AM      Agenda       Minutes          Do pass

Final Passage Votes
   Assembly Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       Apr 21, 2017   Yea 38,   Nay 0,   Excused 4,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0
   Senate Final Passage    (1st Reprint)       May 18, 2017   Yea 21,   Nay 0,   Excused 0,   Not Voting 0,   Absent 0


Bill Text     As Introduced     1st Reprint    As Enrolled       

Adopted Amendments     Amend. No. 29   

Bill History

Nov 17, 2016

  • Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer.

Nov 21, 2016

  • From printer.

Feb 06, 2017

  • Read first time. To committee.

Apr 18, 2017

  • From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended.

Apr 19, 2017

  • Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 29.) To printer.

Apr 20, 2017

  • From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint .
  • Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day.

Apr 21, 2017

Apr 24, 2017

  • In Senate.
  • Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce, Labor and Energy. To committee.

May 17, 2017

  • From committee: Do pass.
  • Placed on Second Reading File.
  • Read second time.

May 18, 2017

May 19, 2017

  • In Assembly. To enrollment.

May 23, 2017

  • Enrolled and delivered to Governor.

May 25, 2017

  • Approved by the Governor. Chapter 125.

Effective May 25, 2017.